Sidhu, Parbaljit Singh (CPSO#: 87589)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Mem Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2525 Old Bronte Road
Suite 200
Oakville ON  L6M4J2
Canada
Phone: 905-582-7533
Fax: 905-582-0766
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. P. Sidhu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Sidhu ( CPSO# 87589 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
West Oak Medical
Suite 200
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 582-7533

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARBALJIT SINGH SIDHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIDHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 14 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 15 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2009