Siedlecki, Jacqueline Barbara Caroline (CPSO#: 90165)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Calgary, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacqueline Barbara Caroline Siedlecki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 24 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
British Columbia
Nunavut

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2009
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Feb 2017