Sieniawski, Rafal (CPSO#: 94916)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Jagiellonian University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 5
130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone: (519) 250-0449
Fax: (519) 968-3705
Electoral District: 01
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

2464 Howard Avenue, Suite 201
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Canada
Phone: (519) 977-6643
Fax: (519) 968-3705
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sieniawski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sieniawski ( CPSO# 94916 )

Business Address:
2464 Howard Avenue
Suite 201
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone Number: (519) 977-6643

Business Address:
Windsor Cardiac Centre
Unit 5
130 Ouellette Place
Windsor ON  N8X 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 250-4449

Business Address:
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4444

Business Address:
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone Number: (519) 254-5577

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Indiana

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 02 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAFAL SIENIAWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIENIAWSKI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 23 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014