Siger, Zaid J Yasser (CPSO#: 81372)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Yasser, Zaid Jabbar (used until: 19 Dec 2017 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
The Court Offices
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite #418
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone: (416) 340-7000
Fax: (416) 340-7001
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Digestive Health Clinic
1031 Brock Rd
Pickering ON  L1W 3T7
Canada
Phone: 905 683 1700
Fax: 906 683 2577
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Digestive Health Clinic
330 HYW 7 East
Suite 510
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3P8
Canada
Phone: 905 707 5007
Fax: 905 707 5008
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Thornhill Endoscopy Centre
Unit 11 & 12
390 Steeles Avenue West
Thornhill ON  L4J 6X2
Canada
Phone: 9058826566
Fax: 9058826567
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

6th. Floor
520 Ellesmere Road
Scarborough ON  M1R 0B1
Canada
Phone: 416 757 3237
Fax: 416 757 7189
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zaid J. Yasser Siger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Siger ( CPSO# 81372 )

Business Address:
2863 Ellesmere Road
Suite 418
Scarborough ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 340-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgical Oncology Effective: 26 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ZAID J YASSER SIGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Surgical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Surgical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009