Sikand, Aman (CPSO#: 96969)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6571
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke General Hospital
89 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Peel Memorial
20 Lynch St.
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sikand Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sikand ( CPSO# 96969 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMAN SIKAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIKAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013