Sikdar, Soma (CPSO#: 91330)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Oct 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calcutta, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Laboratory Medicine
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
P.O. Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G1G3
Phone: (519)-749-4300
Fax: (519)-749-4221
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: 519-744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOMA SIKDAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIKDAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014