Sikorski, Robert (CPSO#: 84546)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:University of Ottawa, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Fax: (807) 346-8015
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional
Health Centre
201 Gerogian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46550
Fax: (705) 739-5613
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Health Sciences Centre Winnipeg
820 Sherbrook St
Winnipeg MB  R3A 1R9
Canada
Phone: (204) 787-2262
Fax: (204) 787-4291
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Sikorski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Sikorski ( CPSO# 84546 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT SIKORSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIKORSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2011