Silkoff, Philip Emanuel (CPSO#: 67930)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 May 1995
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 May 1996
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 03 Aug 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 1997