Silva, Erica Rosario Costa Pinto (CPSO#: 91956)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 28 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Escola de Medicina e Saude Publica, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 04 Aug 2009 to 15 Sep 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 28 Jul 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neuroradiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 2011