Silva Gomez, Cecilia Veronica (CPSO#: 84968)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Nov 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:UNIVERSIDAD EVANGELICA DE EL SALVADOR, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 301
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-1104
Fax: (905) 272-1105
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B1B8
Canada
Phone: 905-813-1100
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Veronica Silva Gomez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Silva Gomez ( CPSO# 84968 )

Business Address:
Renal Care Centre
75 Watline Avenue
Suite 121, 125, 139
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-1104

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
301 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-1104

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 20 Sep 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CECILIA VERONICA SILVA GOMEZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVA GOMEZ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jan 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Sep 2010 to 20 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 21 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 20 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2011