Silvaggio, Mathew Peter (CPSO#: 90643)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Services
Department of Anesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 6846000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mathew Peter Silvaggio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 3 2015


Corporation Name: Silvaggio And Toman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 10 2018


Corporation Name: Dr. Mathew Peter Silvaggio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 30 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Silvaggio ( CPSO# 90643 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Services
Department of Anesthesia
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (806) 864-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATHEW PETER SILVAGGIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVAGGIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014