Silver, Janine Ashley (CPSO#: 89108)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jan 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oak Ridges Medical Centre
13291 Yonge Street, Suite 100
Richmond Hill, On
L4E 4L6
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: (905)773-7759
Fax: (905)773-1325
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Fletcher Cres.
PO Box 4000
Alliston, Ontario
L9R 1W7
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705)434-5144
Fax: (705)434-5131
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Janine Silver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Silver ( CPSO# 89108 )

Business Address:
101 - 13291 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone Number: (905) 773-4444

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
PO Box 4000
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 434-5144

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 04 Jan 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANINE ASHLEY SILVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2014