Silver, Norman Aaron (CPSO#: 73320)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 May 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 08 Apr 1999 to 05 May 1999
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 May 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 2009