Silverman, Howard Jeffrey (CPSO#: 63891)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1992

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 502
1525 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8R9
Phone: (613) 792-4137
Fax: (613) 792-1522
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Howard J. Silverman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Silverman ( CPSO# 63891 )

Business Address:
502 - 1525 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 8R9
Phone Number: (613) 792-4137

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Canada 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y6 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Email: info@rsrs.com
Date Received: 02 Mar 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HOWARD JEFFREY SILVERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1992

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: January 22, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)