Silverman, Jason Andrew (CPSO#: 92428)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 06 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 18 Jan 2010 to 14 Feb 2010
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 25 Oct 2010 to 19 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2013 to 15 Dec 2013
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Feb 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 2013