Simard, Trevor (CPSO#: 97932)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Adult Cardiology Residency Program
Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696-7000
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TREVOR SIMARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 7 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017