Simpson, Charles David Andrew (CPSO#: 83844)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Jan 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jan 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 21 Nov 2005 to 18 Dec 2005
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Jan 2010 to 29 Jan 2010
Elective Trainee - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jan 2010