Simpson, John Allan (CPSO#: 73507)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care
Huntsville Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311
Fax: (705) 789-0057
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Muskoka Algonqian Healthcare
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-4400
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

Nurse Practitioner Led Clinic
5 Centre Street North
Huntsville ON  P1H 2C1
Canada
Phone: (705) 224-6752
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Allan Simpson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Simpson ( CPSO# 73507 )

Business Address:
Nurse Practitioner Led Clinic
5 Centre Street North
Huntsville ON  P1H 2C1
Phone Number: (705) 224-6752

Business Address:
Muskoka Algonqiun Healthcare
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Phone Number: (705) 645-4400

Business Address:
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
Huntsville Hospital
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN ALLAN SIMPSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIMPSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2001