Sinan, Abdul Hamid (CPSO#: 83359)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Damascus, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 15 Sep 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 16 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Transplantation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007