Singam, Thiru (CPSO#: 91498)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
Elective Trainee - Rheumatology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2009