Singarayer, Chandrakumar (CPSO#: 85849)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 21 Dec 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-4363
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singarayer Medicine Professional Corporation/Singarayer Medecine Societe Professionnelle

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 27 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Singarayer ( CPSO# 85849 )

Business Address:
Taunton Health Centre
1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 721-4363

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 20 Jun 2008
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 22 May 2008

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2008 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr.  Chandrakumar  Singarayer  may  practise independently in the area of
                  family medicine only; 

                  (a)   Dr. Singarayer's practice shall  not  include obstetrics in the 2nd
                        and 3rd trimesters of patient care.