Singer, Melissa Cindy (CPSO#: 81516)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 703
240 Duncan Mill Road
Toronto ON  M3B 3S6
Phone: (416) 494-7396
Fax: (416) 494-0129
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 403, 265 Yorkland Boulevard
North York ON  M2J 5C7
Canada
Phone: (416) 229-2399
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA CINDY SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2006