Singer, Oskar (CPSO#: 88513)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia
Room M3200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (418) 480-6100 Ext. 4864
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Oskar Singer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Singer ( CPSO# 88513 )

Business Address:
43 Wellesley Street East
Toronto ON  M4Y 1H1
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
Room M3200
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4864

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre,Holland Orthopaedic & Arthritic Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OSKAR SINGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2013