Singh, Anita Devi (CPSO#: 66774)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1995

Summary

Former Name: Singh, Anita (used until: 19 Dec 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
800 Commissioners Rd E
PO Box 5010 Stn B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 53651
Fax: (519) 685-8808
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anita Devi Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 18 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singh ( CPSO# 66774 )

Business Address:
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Business Address:
550 Wellington Road
London ON  N6C 0A7
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Business Address:
485 Windermere Road
3rd Floor
London ON  N5X 2T1
Phone Number: (519) 438-2102

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANITA DEVI SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995