Singh, Balpreet (CPSO#: 93750)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Rajasthan University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 25 Aug 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Jul 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 19 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2013