Singh, Barinder (CPSO#: 95810)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:University College, Cork, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 24 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 22 Sep 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016