Singh, Dharm Raj (CPSO#: 81130)

Current Status: Active Member as of 22 Feb 2017

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Feb 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Banaras Hindu University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
280 Victoria Street
Dalhousie NB  E8C 2R6
Phone: 5066847677

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DHARM RAJ SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2004 to 23 Aug 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2017