Singh, Jessica (CPSO#: 92822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090 Ext. 43333
Fax: 705-739-5619
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jessica Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Singh ( CPSO# 92822 )

Business Address:
Simcoe Muskoka
Regional Cancer Program
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JESSICA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 30 Jul 2010 to 24 Aug 2010
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013