Singh, Kishore (CPSO#: 75542)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Natal, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
321 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 2X6
Phone: (905) 632-7775
Fax: (905) 632-3762
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. K. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 3 2010


Corporation Name: Dr. K. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Singh ( CPSO# 75542 )

Business Address:
Appleby Medical Centre
321 Appleby Line
Burlington ON  L7L 2X6
Phone Number: (905) 632-7775

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KISHORE SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2000

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: May 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)