Singh, Parul (CPSO#: 87266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parul Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Singh ( CPSO# 87266 )

Business Address:
175 Brentcliffe Road
Toronto ON  M4G 0C5

Business Address:
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bellwood Health Services Inc. Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Nov 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PARUL SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010