Singh, Rittu Gill (CPSO#: 89144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sint Eustatius, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
38 King Street West
Dundas ON  L9H 1T7
Phone: (905) 628-5118
Fax: (905) 628-1739
Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RITTU GILL SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2013 to 11 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2016