Singh, Steve Kelvin (CPSO#: 79470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
189 Cassandra Boulevard
Toronto ON  M3A 1T4
Phone: (416) 443-1472
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Steve K. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 25 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - Massachusetts
USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVE KELVIN SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2011