Singh, Sudha (CPSO#: 73383)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 646-6000 Ext. 64219
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

London Health Sciences Centre
University Hospital
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Canada
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 33282
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Singh and Singh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Singh ( CPSO# 71882 )
Dr. S. Singh ( CPSO# 73383 )

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4223

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
Suite 206
450 Central Avenue
London ON  N6B 2E8
Phone Number: (519) 936-1166

Business Address:
St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6000

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUDHA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 May 2000