Singh, Vishnu Shankar (CPSO#: 89157)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7000
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VISHNU SHANKAR SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2013