Singhal, Rajni (CPSO#: 77622)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
200 Church St
Weston ON M9N 1N8
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Phone: 416-242-1099
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Canada
Phone: 416-242-1000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rajni Singhal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Singhal ( CPSO# 77622 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1099

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAJNI SINGHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jun 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Elective Trainee - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004