Singla, Mohit (CPSO#: 91609)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Christian Medical College, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Congenital Cardioligy Clinic
27-470 Chrysler Dr
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone: (647) 545-4080
Fax: (647) 494-8687
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dept of Pediatrics
Southlake Regional Health System
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: 647-545-4080
Fax: (647) 494-8687
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Suite 306
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2R2
Canada
Phone: (647) 545-4080
Fax: (647) 494-8687
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohit Singla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Singla ( CPSO# 91609 )

Business Address:
27 - 470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (647) 545-4080

Business Address:
Suite 306
679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Paediatric Cardiology Effective: 05 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 05 Apr 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHIT SINGLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 17 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Apr 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Apr 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2014