Singwi, Sanjeev (CPSO#: 83164)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Toronto, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Headwaters Health Care
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone: (519) 941-2702
Fax: (519) 942-0483
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scope Clinic
470 Chrysler Drive
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-9030
Fax: (905) 790-7487
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Eye Consultants
16945 Leslie St.
Newmarket ON  L3Y 8Y8
Canada
Phone: (905) 235-8055
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Singwi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Singwi ( CPSO# 83164 )

Business Address:
16945 Leslie Street
Suite 44
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2
Phone Number: (905) 235-8055

Business Address:
470 Chrysler Drive
Unit 11 - 15
Brampton ON  L6S 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 790-9030

Business Address:
Headwaters Health Care Centre
100 Rolling Hills Drive
Orangeville ON  L9W 4X9
Phone Number: (519) 941-2702

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANJEEV SINGWI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGWI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jul 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2006