Sinnemaki, Lauren Christine (CPSO#: 97963)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Port Arthur Health Centre
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000
Electoral District: 09

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 03 Jul 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAUREN CHRISTINE SINNEMAKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINNEMAKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2014