Sithamparanathan, Karthika (CPSO#: 89930)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:St Bartholomew's & The Royal London Scho, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Platinum Medical Clinic FHG
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1J 2H3
Phone: (416) 265-2255
Fax: (416) 265-6737
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1290 Keith Ross Court
Oshawa ON  L1H7K4
Canada
Phone: 9055763444
Fax: 9055767980
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sithamparanathan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 20 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Sithamparanathan ( CPSO# 89930 )

Business Address:
Platinum Medical Clinic FHG
3170 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1J 2H3
Phone Number: (416) 265-2255

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KARTHIKA SITHAMPARANATHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SITHAMPARANATHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 18 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 21 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010