Siu, Brian King Fang (CPSO#: 95211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
21 Front St. South
UNIT 201
Thorold ON  L2V1W8
Phone: 905-688-6460
Fax: (905) 687-1855
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 202
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S1X8
Canada
Phone: 905-988-1933
Fax: 905-988-5918
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Siu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 25 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Siu ( CPSO# 95384 )
Dr. B. Siu ( CPSO# 95211 )

Business Address:
Neurology Clinic
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 357-3644

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
21 Front Street South
Thorold ON  L2V 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 688-6460

Business Address:
245 Pelham Road
St Catharines ON  L2S 1X8
Phone Number: (905) 988-1933

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN KING FANG SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 2013