Siu, Henry Yu-Hin (CPSO#: 89126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Yu-Hin Siu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Siu ( CPSO# 89126 )

Business Address:
Regina Gardens Nursing Home
536 Upper Paradise Road
Hamilton ON  L9C 5E3
Phone Number: (905) 383-2970

Business Address:
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-1300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HENRY YU-HIN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2010