Siu, Maurice (CPSO#: 72511)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bloor Islington Place
East Tower - 6th Floor
3250 Bloor Street West
Toronto ON  M8X 2X9
Phone: (647) 775-1587
Fax: (416) 256-6056
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
Suite 301
2425 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1K 5G8
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8200 Ext. 6747
Fax: (416) 759-5162
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Mississauga Treatment Clinic
3047 A Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 2G9
Canada
Phone: (905) 279-4848
Fax: (905) 279-6934
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

CAMH
1001 Queen St West
Unit 3-4
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32959
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maurice Siu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 23 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Siu ( CPSO# 72511 )

Business Address:
301 - 2425 Eglinton Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1K 5G8
Phone Number: (416) 431-8283

Business Address:
3047 A Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5A 2G9
Phone Number: (416) 716-0745

Business Address:
3250 Bloor Street West
East Tower - 6th Floor
Toronto ON  M8X 2X9
Phone Number: (416) 716-0745

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAURICE SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003