Siu, Winnie Wing-Yin (CPSO#: 93115)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Public Health Agency of Canada
130 Colonnade Road
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K9
Phone: 343-998-4026
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WINNIE WING-YIN SIU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012