Sivabalasundaram, Vithika (CPSO#: 95775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1333 Neilson Road, Suite 100
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Y9
Phone: 416-291-7719
Fax: (416) 287-3775
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

629 Markham Road, Unit 2
Scarborough ON  M1H 2A4
Canada
Phone: (416) 847-4160
Fax: 866-574-5772
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2330 Kennedy Road, Suite 210
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Canada
Phone: (416) 335-1717
Fax: 416-335-1719
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, 7-NU
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Canada
Phone: 416 340 4609
Fax: 416 340 3750
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VITHIKA SIVABALASUNDARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVABALASUNDARAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015