Sivagangabalan, Gopal (CPSO#: 90448)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 10 Dec 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Dec 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of New South Wales, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jun 2009 to 23 Aug 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 24 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 10 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Dec 2010