Sivalingam, Sriharan (CPSO#: 85671)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 15 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 15 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 2006 to 15 Nov 2006
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 21 May 2007 to 15 Jun 2007
Elective Trainee - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 2007