Sivarajan, Venkatesan Ben (CPSO#: 72559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Apr 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Apr 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stollery Children's Hospital
Div of Ped Card Intensive Care
4-537 ECHA
11405-87 Avenue NW
Edmonton AB  T6G 1C9
Phone: (780) 248-5438
Fax: (888) 790-1283

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 14 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VENKATESAN BEN SIVARAJAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVARAJAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Apr 2007