Sivasubramaniam, Tharsika (CPSO#: 90799)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12637 Tenth Line
Stouffville ON  L4A 7X3
Phone: (905) 591-6060
Fax: (905) 591-6090
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THARSIKA SIVASUBRAMANIAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIVASUBRAMANIAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 13 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Feb 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2012