Skaff, Elie Robbie (CPSO#: 97887)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Sep 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200-110 Bearbrook Road
Ottawa ON  K1B 5R2
Phone: (613) 824-6318
Fax: (613) 824-0521
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elie Skaff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Skaff ( CPSO# 97887 )

Business Address:
200 - 110 Bearbrook Road
Ottawa ON  K1B 5R2
Phone Number: (613) 824-6318

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
2305 Page Road
Ottawa ON  K1W 1H3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Sep 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ELIE ROBBIE SKAFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SKAFF is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 09 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 19 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 20 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 19 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2016