Skala, William Nicholas (CPSO#: 24547)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Southlake Regional Health Centre 596 Davis Dr Newmarket ON L3Y 2P9
Date Received: 15 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 17 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018